Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 06/27/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/16/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/23/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/25/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/26/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/26/2007
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 08/02/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/17/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/20/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/26/2007
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 10/01/2007
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 10/17/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 10/23/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/10/2008