Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 06/28/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/28/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 06/28/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 06/28/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/31/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 08/03/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/22/2007
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 11/02/2007