Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 06/28/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/23/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/25/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 09/05/2007
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/07/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/07/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 02/07/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/07/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 02/12/2008
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/25/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 02/25/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/26/2008
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/13/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/07/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/16/2008
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 04/22/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/14/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/14/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/28/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/12/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/15/2008
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 09/15/2008
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/15/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/15/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/15/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/15/2008
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/15/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 09/15/2008
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/15/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/15/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/15/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 09/15/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/16/2008
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/16/2008
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/16/2008
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 09/16/2008
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/16/2008
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 09/17/2008
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/17/2008
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/17/2008
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/17/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/17/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/18/2008
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/18/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 09/18/2008
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 09/18/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/22/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/22/2008
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 09/22/2008
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/22/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/23/2008
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 09/23/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/23/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/23/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/23/2008
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 09/23/2008
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/24/2008
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 09/25/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/25/2008
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/25/2008