Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 06/29/2007
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 06/29/2007
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 06/29/2007
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 06/29/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 06/29/2007
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 06/29/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 06/29/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 06/29/2007
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 06/29/2007
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 06/29/2007
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 06/29/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 06/29/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 06/29/2007
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 06/29/2007
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 06/29/2007
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 06/29/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 06/29/2007
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 06/29/2007
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/09/2007
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/09/2007
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/09/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 07/09/2007
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 07/10/2007
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 07/10/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 07/10/2007
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/11/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 07/11/2007
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/11/2007
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/12/2007
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/13/2007
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 07/13/2007
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 07/13/2007
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/19/2007
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/26/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/08/2008