Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 07/10/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/18/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/24/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/31/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 08/02/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 08/03/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/04/2007
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/28/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 05/19/2008
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 09/08/2008