There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Healthy Start Reauthorization Act of 2007

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Healthy Start Reauthorization Act of 2007

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Healthy Start Reauthorization Act of 2007

Short Titles as Introduced

Healthy Start Reauthorization Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Public Health Service Act with respect to the Healthy Start Initiative.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/03/2008Became Public Law No: 110-339. (TXT | PDF)
10/03/2008Signed by President.
09/26/2008Presented to President.
09/23/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8670-8671)
04/30/2008Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3644; text of measure as passed Senate: CR S3644)
04/29/2008Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Kennedy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
07/10/2007Introduced in Senate

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
10/03/2008Became Public Law No: 110-339. (TXT | PDF)
10/03/2008Signed by President.
09/26/2008SenatePresented to President.
09/23/2008-8:13pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/23/2008-8:13pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8670-8671)
09/23/2008-8:09pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1760.
09/23/2008-8:09pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8670-8671)
09/23/2008-8:09pmHouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/17/2008HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
09/17/2008HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/05/2008HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/01/2008HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
05/01/2008SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/01/2008-10:08amHouseReceived in the House.
04/30/2008SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3644; text of measure as passed Senate: CR S3644)
04/29/2008SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 723.
04/29/2008SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Kennedy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
03/13/2008SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
07/10/2007SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions07/10/2007 Referred to
03/13/2008 Markup by
04/29/2008 Reported by
House Energy and Commerce05/01/2008 Referred to
09/17/2008 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health05/05/2008 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.1760. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-339 (10/03/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on April 29, 2008. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Healthy Start Reauthorization Act of 2007 [sic] - Amends the Public Health Service Act to require the Secretary of Health and Human Services to consider certain criteria in making grants under the Healthy Start Initiative, including: (1) factors that contribute to infant mortality, such as low birthweight; and (2) the extent to which applicants for grants facilitate a community-based approach to the delivery of services and a comprehensive approach to women's health care to improve perinatal outcomes.

Provides that the Secretary is not prevented from awarding grants for special projects that are intended to address significant disparities in perinatal health indicators in communities along the United States-Mexico border or in Alaska or Hawaii.

Eliminates authority for the Secretary to make additional grants to: (1) assist communities with technical assistance, replication of successful projects, and state policy formation to reduce infant and maternal mortality and morbidity; and (2) conduct and support research and to provide additional health care services for pregnant women and infants.

Reauthorizes appropriations for FY2008-FY2013 for the Healthy Start Initiative.