Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 07/12/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 07/12/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 07/12/2007
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/24/2007
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 08/01/2007
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 08/01/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 12/17/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 01/28/2008
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 01/30/2008
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 02/26/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 04/17/2008
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/11/2008