Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 07/16/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 07/16/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/23/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/23/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/23/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/05/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/10/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 12/06/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 01/31/2008