Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 07/17/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 07/17/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 07/17/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 07/17/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 07/17/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 07/17/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/18/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/18/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/18/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/10/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/10/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/10/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 09/17/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 11/06/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/13/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 01/28/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/25/2008