Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/19/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/31/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/11/2008
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 09/09/2008
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/09/2008
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 09/18/2008