Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 07/18/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 07/18/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 07/18/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/24/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/10/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 11/13/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 12/03/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 01/22/2008
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/21/2008