Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/11/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/19/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 10/24/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 02/06/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/03/2008