Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 07/19/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 08/02/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/06/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/12/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/17/2007