Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 07/20/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 07/20/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 07/20/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 07/20/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 07/20/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 07/20/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 07/20/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 07/20/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 07/20/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 07/20/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 07/20/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 07/20/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 07/20/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/20/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/23/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/23/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/23/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/23/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/30/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/30/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 08/03/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/04/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/12/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/18/2007
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/18/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 10/01/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/18/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 10/22/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 10/25/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 10/25/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 11/01/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 12/18/2007
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 02/05/2008
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/07/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 02/11/2008
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/06/2008
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/06/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 04/02/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/02/2008
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/02/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/10/2008
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/14/2008
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 04/22/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/22/2008
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/15/2008