There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Second Higher Education Extension Act of 2007

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Second Higher Education Extension Act of 2007

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Second Higher Education Extension Act of 2007

Short Titles as Introduced

Second Higher Education Extension Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to temporarily extend the programs under the Higher Education Act of 1965, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
07/31/2007Became Public Law No: 110-51. (TXT | PDF)
07/31/2007Signed by President.
07/31/2007Presented to President.
07/25/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text as passed in House: CR H8411)
07/24/2007Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9824; text as passed Senate: CR S9824)
07/24/2007Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
07/31/2007Became Public Law No: 110-51. (TXT | PDF)
07/31/2007Signed by President.
07/31/2007SenatePresented to President.
07/25/2007-11:32amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/25/2007-11:32amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text as passed in House: CR H8411)
07/25/2007-11:29amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1868.
07/25/2007-11:29amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8411-8412)
07/25/2007-11:29amHouseMr. Hinojosa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/24/2007-6:50pmHouseHeld at the desk.
07/24/2007SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/24/2007-6:17pmHouseReceived in the House.
07/24/2007SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9824; text as passed Senate: CR S9824)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 07/24/2007

Committees (0)

As of 08/24/2019 text has not been received for S.1868 - Second Higher Education Extension Act of 2007

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.1868. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-51 (07/31/2007)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Second Higher Education Extension Act of 2007 - Amends the Higher Education Extension Act of 2005 to extend the programs under the Higher Education Act of 1965 through October 31, 2007.