Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 07/26/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/04/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 09/04/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 09/12/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/12/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/12/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/31/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 11/07/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 11/13/2007