There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 11 Central Street in Hillsborough, New Hampshire, as the "Officer Jeremy Todd Charron Post Office".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/26/2007Became Public Law No: 110-169. (TXT | PDF)
12/26/2007Signed by President.
12/21/2007Presented to President.
12/19/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H16857)
08/03/2007Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10978-10979; text as passed Senate: CR S10979)
08/01/2007Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
07/30/2007Introduced in Senate

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
12/26/2007Became Public Law No: 110-169. (TXT | PDF)
12/26/2007Signed by President.
12/21/2007SenatePresented to President.
12/19/2007-11:49amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/19/2007-11:49amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H16857)
12/19/2007-11:46amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1896.
12/19/2007-11:46amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H16857-16858)
12/19/2007-11:45amHouseMr. Davis (IL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/23/2007HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
10/23/2007HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
08/04/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
08/04/2007SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/04/2007-1:35pmHouseReceived in the House.
08/03/2007SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10978-10979; text as passed Senate: CR S10979)
08/01/2007SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 301.
08/01/2007SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
08/01/2007SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/30/2007SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
07/30/2007SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S10316)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 07/30/2007

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs07/30/2007 Referred to
08/01/2007 Markup by
08/01/2007 Reported by
House Oversight and Government Reform08/04/2007 Referred to
10/23/2007 Markup by

No related bill information was received for S.1896.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1896. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-169 (12/26/2007)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 11 Central Street in Hillsborough, New Hampshire, as the "Officer Jeremy Todd Charron Post Office."