Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 07/31/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 07/31/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/05/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/17/2007
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/17/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 09/17/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/02/2007
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 11/08/2007