There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Protect America Act of 2007

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Protect America Act of 2007

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Protect America Act of 2007

Short Titles as Introduced

Protect America Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Act of 1978 to provide additional procedures for authorizing certain acquisitions of foreign intelligence information and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
08/05/2007Became Public Law No: 110-55. (TXT | PDF)
08/05/2007Signed by President.
08/05/2007Presented to President.
08/04/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 227 - 183 (Roll no. 836).(text: CR H9953-9954)
08/03/2007Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 60 - 28. Record Vote Number: 309.(text: CR S10871-10872)
08/01/2007Introduced in Senate

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/25/2007SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
08/05/2007Became Public Law No: 110-55. (TXT | PDF)
08/05/2007Signed by President.
08/05/2007SenatePresented to President.
08/04/2007-10:19pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
08/04/2007-10:19pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 227 - 183 (Roll no. 836). (text: CR H9953-9954)
08/04/2007-9:59pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to a previous order of the House. (consideration: CR H9965)
08/04/2007-8:31pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to a previous special order, the House proceeded with one hour of debate on S. 1927.
08/04/2007-8:31pmHouseConsidered pursuant to a previous order.
08/04/2007-8:31pmHouseConsideration initiated pursuant to a previous order. (consideration: CR H9952-9966)
08/04/2007-11:20amHouseHeld at the desk.
08/04/2007-11:08amHouseReceived in the House.
08/03/2007SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/03/2007SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 60 - 28. Record Vote Number: 309. (text: CR S10871-10872)
08/03/2007SenateS.Amdt.2649 Amendment SA 2649 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
08/03/2007SenateS.Amdt.2649 Amendment SA 2649 proposed by Senator McConnell. (consideration: CR S10861; text: CR S10861) To provide a sunset provision.
08/03/2007SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S10861-10872)
08/02/2007SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 324.
08/01/2007SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 08/01/2007

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary09/25/2007 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.1927. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-55 (08/05/2007)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on August 3, 2007. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Protect America Act of 2007 - Amends the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Act of 1978 (FISA) to state that nothing under its definition of "electronic surveillance" shall be construed to encompass surveillance directed at a person reasonably believed to be located outside the United States.

Allows the Director of National Intelligence (DNI) and the Attorney General (AG), for periods up to one year, to authorize the acquisition of foreign intelligence information concerning persons outside the United States if the DNI and AG determine that: (1) there are reasonable procedures in place for determining that such acquisition concerns persons outside the United States, and such procedures will be subject to review by the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Court (Court); (2) the acquisition does not constitute electronic surveillance; (3) the acquisition involves obtaining foreign intelligence information from or with the assistance of a communication service provider or other person who has access to communications; (4) a significant purpose of the acquisition is to obtain foreign intelligence information; and (5) the minimization procedures (procedures to ensure the smallest level of privacy intrusion while obtaining such information) to be used meet the definition of minimization procedures under FISA. Requires such determination to be certified and submitted to the Court.

Requires the AG to report to: (1) the Court the procedures by which the government determines that such acquisitions do not constitute electronic surveillance; and (2) the congressional intelligence and judiciary committees semiannually concerning acquisitions made during the previous six-month period.

Terminates this Act 180 days after its enactment. Makes authorizations for the acquisition of information made by this Act, and directives issued pursuant to such authorizations, effective until their expiration.