There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Protecting Children in the 21st Century Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Protecting Children in the 21st Century Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting Children in the 21st Century Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to protect children from cybercrimes, including crimes by online predators, to enhance efforts to identify and eliminate child pornography, and to help parents shield their children from material that is inappropriate for minors.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/22/2008Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S4839)
12/12/2007Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Inouye with amendments. With written report No. 110-245.
08/02/2007Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
06/03/2008HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
06/03/2008-2:13pmHouseReceived in the House.
05/23/2008SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/22/2008SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S4839)
05/22/2008SenateS.Amdt.4819 Amendment SA 4819 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
05/22/2008SenateS.Amdt.4819 Amendment SA 4819 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Stevens. (consideration: CR S4838-4839; text: CR S4839) To strike the authorization of appropriations and the additional child pornography amendments.
05/22/2008SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4837-4839; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S4837-4838)
12/12/2007SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 538.
12/12/2007SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Inouye with amendments. With written report No. 110-245.
09/27/2007SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
08/02/2007SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation08/02/2007 Referred to
09/27/2007 Markup by
12/12/2007 Reported by S. Rept. 110-245
House Energy and Commerce06/03/2008 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1965. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (05/22/2008)

Protecting Children in the 21st Century Act - Title I: Promoting a Safe Internet for Children - (Sec. 101) Declares that the issue of Internet safety includes issues regarding the use of the Internet in a manner that promotes safe online activity for children, protects children from cybercrimes, including crimes by online predators, and helps parents shield their children from material that is inappropriate for minors.

(Sec. 102) Directs the Federal Trade Commission (FTC) to carry out a nationwide program to increase public awareness and provide education on strategies to promote the safe use of the Internet by children.

(Sec. 103) Requires the FTC to submit annual reports (by March 31) to the Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation on the activities of its public awareness campaign.

(Sec. 104) Directs the Assistant Secretary of Commerce for Communications and Information to establish an Online Safety and Technology working group to review and evaluate: (1) the status of industry efforts to promote online safety for children; (2) the recordkeeping practices of electronic communications and remote computing service providers in connection with crimes against children; and (3) the development of technologies to help parents protect their children from inappropriate material on the Internet.

Requires the working group to report to the Assistant Secretary and the Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation on its findings. Renders the Federal Advisory Committee Act inapplicable to the working group.

(Sec. 105) Amends the Communications Act of 1934 to require elementary and secondary schools with computer access to the Internet to educate minors about appropriate online behavior, including online interaction with other individuals in social networking websites and in chat rooms and cyberbullying awareness and response.

Title II: Enhancing Child Pornography Enforcement - Amends the Communications Act of 1934 to impose a forfeiture penalty on Internet service providers who violate requirements of the Victims of Child Abuse Act of 1990 to report online child pornography.