Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 08/02/2007
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 08/02/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 08/02/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 08/02/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 08/03/2007
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/19/2007
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 09/24/2007
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 09/25/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/27/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/27/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/27/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/27/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 10/02/2007
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/15/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 11/07/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 11/08/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 11/15/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 11/15/2007
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 12/03/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 01/22/2008