Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/24/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 10/30/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/05/2007
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 11/14/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 11/15/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 12/12/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 01/29/2008
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 01/30/2008