Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 08/03/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 09/24/2007
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 10/23/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 01/28/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/27/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/04/2008
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/05/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 03/11/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/06/2008