Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 09/06/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 09/11/2007
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 09/17/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/19/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/20/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/24/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 11/07/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 11/13/2007
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 12/11/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 12/17/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/11/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 10/01/2008