Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 09/10/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 09/10/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/25/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/26/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/17/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/06/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/01/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/07/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 04/10/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 04/14/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/14/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 04/15/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/17/2008
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/06/2008
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 06/06/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/17/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/14/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/17/2008
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/23/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/23/2008