Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 09/12/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/20/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/20/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/03/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 10/15/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/30/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 11/02/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 11/07/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 12/06/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 02/14/2008