Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 09/17/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/21/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/02/2007
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 10/03/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/15/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 10/15/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 11/06/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 11/15/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 12/03/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 12/11/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/17/2007
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 01/22/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/09/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 07/08/2008