Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/15/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 10/25/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/05/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/16/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 11/16/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 12/03/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 12/04/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 12/05/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 12/19/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/02/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/22/2008