Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 09/18/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 12/19/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 12/19/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 01/22/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 01/22/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 01/22/2008
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/12/2008
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/13/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 03/31/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/14/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/14/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 04/14/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/14/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/14/2008
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/17/2008
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 04/17/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/24/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/24/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/29/2008
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/01/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/01/2008
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/07/2008
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/12/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/13/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/15/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/15/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/10/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/11/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/17/2008
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/17/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 06/18/2008
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/18/2008
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 06/25/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/08/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/15/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/15/2008
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/21/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 09/10/2008
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/18/2008
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 10/02/2008