Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 01/12/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 01/17/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 01/24/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 01/24/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 01/29/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 02/06/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/12/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/12/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 02/13/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/14/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/14/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 02/26/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/01/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/01/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/01/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/01/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/05/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/22/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 04/10/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 04/10/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/10/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/12/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/20/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 05/03/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/08/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/15/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 05/23/2007
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/13/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/22/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/17/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 09/07/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 01/25/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/03/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 09/24/2008
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/24/2008