Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 09/18/2007
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 09/25/2007
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 09/25/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/25/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 09/25/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 09/28/2007
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/28/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/03/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 10/04/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 10/15/2007
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 10/17/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 10/30/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/31/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 01/24/2008
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 01/24/2008
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 01/28/2008
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 01/29/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 01/29/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/21/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 11/19/2008
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 12/10/2008