Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 09/18/2007
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 09/18/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 09/18/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 09/18/2007
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 09/18/2007
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 09/18/2007
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/25/2007
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 10/01/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 10/17/2007
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 12/03/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 12/07/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 01/22/2008
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 04/10/2008
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 05/01/2008
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/15/2008
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 06/26/2008