Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 09/19/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 09/19/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 09/19/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 09/19/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 09/19/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/24/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/24/2007
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 09/27/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 10/04/2007
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 10/30/2007
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 11/07/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 11/07/2007
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 11/07/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/07/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 11/07/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 11/07/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/08/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 11/08/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 11/13/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/13/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/14/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/14/2007
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 12/03/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 12/03/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 12/03/2007
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 12/03/2007
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 12/03/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 12/03/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 12/03/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 12/05/2007
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 12/05/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 12/06/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 12/06/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 12/10/2007
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 12/13/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 01/22/2008
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/05/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/06/2008