Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 09/25/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 09/25/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 09/25/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/26/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 11/13/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 01/22/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/17/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/28/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/31/2008
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/15/2008
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 11/17/2008