Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 01/10/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 01/10/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 01/10/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 01/29/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/28/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/19/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/16/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/17/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/20/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/16/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/23/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/24/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/18/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 02/25/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/12/2008
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 04/29/2008
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/12/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/15/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 07/17/2008
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/31/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/16/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/25/2008