Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/15/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/17/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/17/2007
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/25/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 10/25/2007
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 10/29/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 10/31/2007
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 11/01/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 11/05/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 11/06/2007
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 11/06/2007
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 11/06/2007
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 11/13/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 12/03/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 12/03/2007
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 12/03/2007
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 12/03/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 12/10/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 12/10/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 12/13/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 12/14/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 12/17/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 12/18/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 12/18/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 12/19/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 01/22/2008
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 01/28/2008
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 01/30/2008
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 02/04/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 02/07/2008
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/08/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 02/08/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 02/08/2008
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 02/12/2008
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/25/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 02/25/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/25/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/26/2008
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/28/2008
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 02/29/2008
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/29/2008
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/03/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/04/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/04/2008
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/05/2008
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 03/12/2008
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/13/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 04/10/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/06/2008
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/02/2008