Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 10/01/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/16/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 10/30/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 10/30/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 11/01/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 11/06/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/14/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 12/11/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/26/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/11/2008
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/11/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/31/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/06/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/12/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/12/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/20/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/05/2008