Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 10/03/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 10/03/2007
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 10/03/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/15/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 10/15/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 10/15/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 10/17/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 12/10/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 12/14/2007