Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 10/03/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/16/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 10/23/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 10/29/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/05/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 11/08/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 11/14/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 12/10/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 12/17/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 01/23/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 01/31/2008
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/14/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/14/2008