Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 10/15/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 10/15/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 10/15/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 10/15/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 10/15/2007
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 10/15/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 10/15/2007
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 10/15/2007
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA]* 10/15/2007
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 10/15/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 10/15/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/29/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 11/07/2007
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 11/07/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/07/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 11/07/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 11/07/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 11/07/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 11/07/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 11/07/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 12/04/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 12/10/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 12/10/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 12/10/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 12/18/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 01/24/2008
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 01/24/2008
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/13/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/13/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/13/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/13/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/13/2008
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/13/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/13/2008
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/13/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 03/13/2008
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 03/13/2008
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/13/2008
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/13/2008
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/13/2008
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/13/2008
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 03/13/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 03/13/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/13/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/13/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/13/2008
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/13/2008
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/13/2008
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 03/13/2008
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/13/2008
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 03/13/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 03/13/2008
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/13/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/13/2008
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/13/2008
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 03/13/2008
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/13/2008
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 03/13/2008
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/13/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/13/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/13/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/13/2008
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 03/13/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/13/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/13/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/13/2008
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 03/13/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/13/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/13/2008
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 04/01/2008