Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 10/15/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 10/15/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 11/14/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 12/06/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/04/2008
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 04/29/2008
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 04/29/2008
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 04/30/2008
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/08/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/21/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/22/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 09/11/2008