Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 10/23/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/25/2007
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 12/03/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/11/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 05/06/2008
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/06/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 05/06/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/07/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/07/2008
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/22/2008
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/03/2008
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/26/2008