Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 10/16/2007
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 10/16/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 10/16/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 10/16/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/30/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 10/30/2007
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/30/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/05/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 11/05/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 11/06/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 11/07/2007