Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 10/17/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 10/17/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/18/2007
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/22/2007
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 10/25/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 10/29/2007
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 10/31/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 11/07/2007