Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 10/17/2007
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 10/17/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 10/17/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 10/17/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 10/17/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/30/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 11/01/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 11/02/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 11/07/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 11/15/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 11/15/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/15/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 11/16/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 12/03/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 12/03/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 12/11/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 01/23/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 03/10/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/08/2008
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/08/2008