Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 10/17/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 10/30/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 02/11/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/16/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/06/2008