Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/16/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 02/16/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/26/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 02/26/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 02/26/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/01/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/13/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/19/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/22/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/16/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/09/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/10/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/14/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/23/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/12/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/12/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/13/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/27/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/27/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/11/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/12/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/24/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 10/22/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 10/24/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 11/14/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 11/15/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 12/03/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 12/03/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 12/04/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 12/18/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 01/22/2008
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 01/29/2008
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/25/2008
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/28/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 02/28/2008
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/28/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/28/2008
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/29/2008
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 02/29/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/03/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/05/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/05/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/05/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/06/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/06/2008
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/10/2008
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/11/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 03/11/2008
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/13/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 04/03/2008
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/07/2008
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/10/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/14/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/17/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/17/2008
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/28/2008
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 05/12/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew