Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 10/25/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 10/25/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 10/25/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 10/25/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 11/06/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 12/03/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 01/25/2008
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 04/07/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/14/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/23/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/26/2008