Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 10/25/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 10/30/2007
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 12/04/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 12/13/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/05/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/15/2008