Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 10/29/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 10/29/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 10/29/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 10/29/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 10/29/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 11/01/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 11/01/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/06/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 11/08/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/13/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 11/13/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/13/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/13/2007
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 11/13/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 11/14/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 11/14/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 12/11/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 12/11/2007
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 12/12/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 12/17/2007